Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - Zero-Emission Medium- and Heavy-Duty Vehicles - Regulations (Clean Trucks Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Fraser-Hidalgo, Charkoudian, Foley, Guyton, Moon, Queen, Terrasa, Turner, Vogel, Addison, Allen, Barve, Healey, Holmes, Lehman, J. Long, Ruth, Stein, and Stewart
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations on or before December 1, 2023, establishing requirements for the sale of new zero-emission medium- and heavy-duty vehicles in the State; defining a "heavy-duty vehicle" as one with a gross vehicle weight rating equal to or greater than 14,001 pounds; requiring the Department, in consultation with certain units of State government, to prepare and submit to the General Assembly a certain needs assessment and deployment plan by December 1, 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0224
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0829 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/19/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/19/2023
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {213827/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (38-92)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {523920/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (38-93)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {233826/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (39-96)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Floor Amendment {823224/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (36-95)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Kaufman) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
58AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2023
Legislative Date
4/05/2023
Action
Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
4/07/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/27/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/02/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2023
Legislative Date
4/21/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of the Environment - Zero-Emission Medium- and Heavy-Duty Vehicles - Regulations (Clean Trucks Act of 2023)
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2023 3/30/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/30/2023 3/19/2023 Favorable with Amendments {873829/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2023 3/19/2023 Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2023 3/20/2023 Floor Amendment {213827/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (38-92) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2023 3/20/2023 Floor Amendment {523920/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (38-93) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2023 3/20/2023 Floor Amendment {233826/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (39-96) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2023 3/20/2023 Floor Amendment {823224/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (36-95) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2023 3/20/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of the Environment - Zero-Emission Medium- and Heavy-Duty Vehicles - Regulations (Clean Trucks Act of 2023)
House 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Kaufman) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2023 3/21/2023 Referred Rules 58AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2023 4/05/2023 Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2023 4/07/2023 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/07/2023 3/26/2023 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2023 3/26/2023 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2023 3/27/2023 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2023 4/02/2023 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2023 4/21/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Text - Chapter - Department of the Environment - Zero-Emission Medium- and Heavy-Duty Vehicles - Regulations (Clean Trucks Act of 2023)
(   2-1103.1 )
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page