Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Rate Suspension Proceedings
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the number of days from 150 to 180 for which the Public Service Commission may initially suspend a public service company's proposed rate; and allowing the Commission to extend a rate suspension for up to an additional 90 days if the filing is for an alternative form of ratemaking for a public service company.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0131
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Rate Suspension Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Rate Suspension Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission - Rate Suspension Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Rate Suspension Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {323020/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Rate Suspension Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Finance 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission - Rate Suspension Proceedings
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page