Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Charles, Allen, Bagnall, Buckel, Fair, Grossman, Harris, Henson, J. Long, Reilly, Taveras, Taylor, and Tomlinson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $20,000 of military retirement income received by an individual during the taxable year if the individual has received a determination of a 100% service-connected disability from the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0473 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page