Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classroom Video Recording Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton and Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Self-Contained Special Education Classroom Video Recording Pilot Program for selected public school classrooms in which all of the regularly attending students have a disability and are in that classroom for at least 50% of the instructional day; requiring certain public schools to allow the installation of a video recording device in a certain classroom; requiring notification of the appropriate law enforcement agency on receipt of a complaint of alleged neglect or abuse of a student; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0577
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0715 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {443728/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (40-87)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Cox) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools – Self–Contained Special Education Classroom – Use of Video Recording Devices
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {363928/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Floor Amendment {443728/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (40-87) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Cox) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classroom Video Recording Pilot Program
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-4) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/28/2022 6:11 PM
Click to return on the top page