Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Love and Ruth
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland to review the Maryland Recycling Act, study the recycling and waste systems in Maryland, and make recommendations on updating the Maryland Recycling Act and implementing regional recycling and waste disposal facilities; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to certain legislative Committees by June 30, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0807 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2022 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page