Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to ensure that each public school provide, at no charge to students, menstrual hygiene products via dispensers in women's restrooms at the school; requiring a public middle or high school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least two women's restrooms by October 1, 2022, and all women's restrooms by August 1, 2025; requiring the State to reimburse a county board for the costs of purchasing and installing menstrual hygiene dispensers; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0427
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0208 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/24/2020
Legislative Date
9/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-43)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {404532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-27)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/24/2020 9/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {404532/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (109-27) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Age
(   7-447 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page