Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year, to install at least one video recording device in each special education classroom; requiring video recording devices to record special education classrooms and exclusion areas during school hours and during any time that the classroom or exclusion area is in use; prohibiting the use of a video recording device in bathrooms or in areas that students use to change clothing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1292 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2020
Legislative Date
7/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2020 7/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page