Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring all law enforcement agencies to adopt policies and procedures for the use of body-worn cameras consistent with certain policies developed by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission by October 1, 2021; and requiring all law enforcement agencies to issue body-worn cameras for certain police officers to use while on duty by October 1, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety – Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page