Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority – Program for Payment of Unpaid Video Tolls
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a program to be administered by the Maryland Transportation Authority for State residents to resolve unpaid video tolls and related civil penalties; requiring the Authority to notify a resident who may be eligible to participate in the program; requring the Authority to waive 70% of delinquent video tolls and related civil penalties that became delinquent before July 1, 2022 and require a resident to obtain an E-ZPass by June 30, 2024 and pay a certain remaining balance; authorizing a monthly installment plan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority – Program for Payment of Unpaid Video Tolls
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 10:37 AM
Click to return on the top page