Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from certain retirement plans within a certain subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain individuals who are at least 65 years of age or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; altering the maximum amount of the subtraction modification beginning in taxable year 2021; providing that income included in certain subtraction modifications may not be taken into account for purposes of the subtraction modification for retirement income; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0061 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2020
Legislative Date
9/18/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2020 9/18/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page