Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey and Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each local board of elections to send by nonforwardable mail, a vote-by-mail ballot to each individual who is registered to vote as of the 21st day before the day of each election; requiring that vote-by-mail ballots be mailed at a certain time; requiring a voter to take certain actions to vote a vote-by-mail ballot; requiring that the instructions provided with each vote-by-mail ballot include a certain warning; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/19/2020
Legislative Date
8/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Elections by Mail
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/19/2020 8/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Elections by Mail
Last Updated: 5/11/2021 9:07 AM
Click to return on the top page