Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Prohibition on Rent Increases and Sealing of Court Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from increasing a tenant's rent because a judgment was entered against the tenant in a failure to pay rent action; requiring the District Court to seal all court records within 60 days after the final resolution of a failure to pay rent proceeding under certain circumstances; requiring the District Court to seal all courts records relating to a failure to pay rent proceeding, on motion by a tenant, under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Judiciary to publish on its website a certain form; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1008 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): August 1, 2022, October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/18/2021
Legislative Date
8/18/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/18/2021 8/18/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Text - First - Failure to Pay Rent Proceedings - Prohibition on Rent Increases and Sealing of Court Records
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page