Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person registered to provide debt settlement services to make certain disclosures to consumers relating to student education loan debt; requiring that an advertisement for debt settlement services for student education loan debt relief include a certain disclosure; and prohibiting debt settlement services providers from taking certain actions with respect to student education loan debt relief.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/29/2021
Legislative Date
9/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453524/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-26)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/29/2021 9/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Text - First - Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453524/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (99-26) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Text - Chapter - Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page