Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Peace Orders - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions granting the juvenile court jurisdiction over a peace order proceeding in which the respondent is a minor.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/18/2021
Legislative Date
8/18/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Peace Orders - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/18/2021 8/18/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Peace Orders - Repeal
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page