Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum interest rate from 1% to 0.15%, used to determine minimum nonforfeiture amounts for annuity contracts.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0164
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-5)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 4:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-5) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Finance 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Text - Chapter - Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:19 PM
Click to return on the top page