Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and each county board of education to adopt an attendance policy for public school students that treats an absence due to a student's behavioral health needs the same as an absence due to illness or another somatic health need; and requiring a public school to provide information to a student or the student's parent or guardian about school or community behavioral health resources that are available to the student.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0461 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713123/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-13)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793125/1
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {213129/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {213129/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {293422/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-27)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-18)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713123/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (117-13) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793125/1 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793125/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Floor Amendment {213129/1 (Senator Hough) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Floor Amendment {213129/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Floor Amendment {293422/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-27) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (109-18) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences
(   7-301.3 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page