Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property – Eviction Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Henson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the District Court to seal all court records relating to an eviction proceeding for 30 days or 3 years, subject to a certain exception, after the final resolution of an eviction proceeding, as determined by certain factors; authorizing the District Court to seal court records relating to an action of eviction at any time on a motion by the tenant if the tenant makes a certain demonstration by a preponderance of the evidence or if the District Court makes a certain determination; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Residential Property – Eviction Proceedings – Sealing of Court Records
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page