Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting private education lenders and private education loan collectors from initiating a certain action unless the private education lenders or private education loan collectors possess certain documents; requiring a private education lender or private education loan collector to introduce certain information in a private education loan collection action; and requiring a private education loan collector to provide certain information to a student loan borrower in a certain communication and on request of the student loan borrower.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0732
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0026 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2021
Legislative Date
10/19/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-30)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2021 10/19/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Text - First - Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {363729/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (109-30) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-1301 through 5-1304 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page