Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing certain State policy goals with regard to the State's electric distribution system; requiring the Public Service Commission and the Maryland Energy Administration to provide assistance and support to electric companies for applying for and obtaining access to certain federal funds to meet the State's policy goals for the electric distribution system; requiring the Administration to identify certain funding sources; establishing labor standards for contractors and subcontractors participating in certain projects; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0525
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {473127/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-801 through 7-804 )
Last Updated: 4/29/2022 9:22 AM
Click to return on the top page