Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Jones, Bagnall, Bartlett, Feldmark, and Henson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a school bus be routed with the intent that the number of pupils on the bus does not exceed the manufacturer's rated seating capacity for the bus; and providing that if an emergency or temporary situation causes the number of pupils on the bus to exceed the seating capacity, the situation shall be corrected within a reasonable period of time.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0253
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1226 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/07/2020
Legislative Date
7/07/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/07/2020 7/07/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page