Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Circuit Court Judges – Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that certain provisions of election law govern the nomination and election of circuit court judges, subject to certain exceptions; requiring circuit court judges to be elected on a nonpartisan basis; specifying that any registered voter of a county is eligible to vote in a primary election to nominate candidates for circuit court judge; specifying certain requirements for candidates for election as a circuit court judge; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2020
Legislative Date
10/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Circuit Court Judges – Nonpartisan Elections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2020 10/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Circuit Court Judges – Nonpartisan Elections
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
(   8-901 through 8-905 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page