Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interagency Commission on School Construction – Systemic Renovation Projects – Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegate Watson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to consider systemic renovation projects, regardless of cost, as eligible for funding from the Supplemental Public School Construction Financing Fund and the Supplemental Public School Construction Facilities Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0040
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2022
Legislative Date
1/22/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Interagency Commission on School Construction – Systemic Renovation Projects – Eligibility
House 1/22/2022 1/22/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page