Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations to promote homeownership and create wealth-building opportunities for minority households and promote community revitalization through targeted investments in homeownership; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0117
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2020
Legislative Date
10/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/14/2020 10/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page