Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsored by
Delegate Reilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an entity operating a school bus under a contract with the Harford County Board of Education to provide student transportation services may not be held liable beyond the limits of the entity's insurance coverage under the contract with the Harford County Board of Education through the Maryland Association of Boards of Education in any suit that arises from a vehicular accident or an act or omission of an officer, a director, or an employee of the entity except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0129
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
(   7-810 )
Last Updated: 6/4/2021 12:12 PM
Click to return on the top page