Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Belcastro, Boyce, Solomon, Terrasa, Barve, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Lierman, Ruth, Stein, and Stewart
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from purchasing, selling, offering for sale, or possessing with the intent to sell parts or products of certain animal species under certain circumstances, subject to certain exceptions; requiring that fines and restitution imposed under the Act be credited to the Department of Natural Resources for the benefit of the State Wildlife Management and Protection Fund to be used for the preservation of threatened or endangered species; providing increasing penalties for repeated violations of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0381
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-14)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {163029/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-14) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
(   10-209,   10-2B-01 through 10-2B-09 )
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page