Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Abortion, Artificial Insemination, and Sterilization – Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, rather than prohibiting, licensed hospitals, hospital directors, and hospital governing boards to authorize within the hospitals the performance of any medical procedure that results in artificial insemination, sterilization, or termination of pregnancy or to refer to any source for these medical procedures.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health – Abortion, Artificial Insemination, and Sterilization – Requirement
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/14/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page