Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Contracts – Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public institution of higher education in the State from entering into or renewing a contract with U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; and providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2020
Legislative Date
10/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education – Contracts – Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2020 10/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education – Contracts – Prohibition
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-126 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page