Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain discovery or perception of, or belief about, another person's religious beliefs, disability, or homelessness does not constitute certain provocation to mitigate a killing from the crime of murder to manslaughter and is not a defense to the crime of assault in any degree.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Religious Beliefs, Disability, or Homelessness
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page