Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program to provide $3,500,000 annually to assist local jurisdictions in creating and supporting interjurisdictional policing agreements; requiring the executive director to establish guidelines for counties to apply for and receive grants and to make grants from the program; requiring the Governor to provide funds each fiscal year; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer and report on the program.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
Text - First - Public Safety – Interjurisdictional Policing Grant Program – Establishment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-1501 through 4-1504 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page