Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain county boards of education seeking State funds for the construction of a new school, or the renovation of or an addition to an existing school that would increase the capacity by more than 100 students, to submit a pedestrian safety plan to the Interagency Commission on School Construction; requiring the Interagency Commission to approve the pedestrian safety plan if the plan meets certain qualifications; and requiring a county board to make all determinations about the contents of a pedestrian safety plan.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0487 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-20)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-17)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {893921/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (114-20) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693426/1 Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (113-17) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Text - Chapter - Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
(   5-324 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page