Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making certain provisions of law relating to the issuance of certain emergency orders subject to the Act; providing that a certain declaration is only effective with a certain approval by the General Assembly and for only a certain period of time; repealing a certain provision of legislative intent; altering certain criminal penalties; requiring the Governor to take certain actions within a certain number of days of the issuance of a certain emergency order; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/14/2020
Legislative Date
7/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/14/2020 7/14/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page