Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegate Rogers
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of certain subtraction modifications under the Maryland income tax for individuals who are at least 55 years of age for certain retirement income received as a result of the individual's military service or attributable to the individual's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0083
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0461 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/18/2022
Legislative Date
11/18/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/18/2022 11/18/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
House 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page