Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creating Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs, subject to the availability of funding, to create a network of neighborhood-based centers providing immigrant services, assist law enforcement in combatting crimes against immigrants, and promote civic and economic participation among immigrant communities; requiring the Director to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 15 each year describing calls received by the Office, the number of immigrants assisted and all other relevant information; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0085
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-31)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {594735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-38)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Creating Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
House 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-31) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {594735/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (101-38) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Creating Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
(   9-3301 through 9-3304 )
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page