Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to coordinate the implementation of advance care planning programs in the State; requiring each health insurance carrier to offer electronic advance directives to its members and enrollees at certain times and make arrangements to receive certain notifications; and authorizing a health insurance carrier to contract with an electronic advance directives service under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0048
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page