Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making certain provisions of law governing the protection of information by government agencies applicable to the Legislative and Judicial branches of State government; requiring the Maryland Cybersecurity Coordinating Council to develop a Cybersecurity Awareness and Training Program; establishing certain criteria for the Program; requiring the State Chief Information Security Officer to coordinate with the Council to certify certain cybersecurity trainings; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0107
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/12/2021
Legislative Date
10/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/12/2021 10/12/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
(   10-1301,   10-1302,   10-13B-01 through 10-13B-04 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page