Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, on or after July 1, 2023, an individual in the State who is at least 21 years old may use and possess cannabis.
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/12/2021
Legislative Date
8/12/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {543728/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-94)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {173321/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (38-94)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-34)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983820/1
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-39)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/12/2021 8/12/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/14 at 10:00 a.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {543728/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-94) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {173321/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (38-94) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-34) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Finance 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983820/1 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983820/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-39) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 45
Text - Chapter - Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Adult Use and Possession
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page