Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Individual Income Tax Credit Eligibility Awareness Campaign
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Comptroller)
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to implement and administer a certain individual income tax credit eligibility awareness campaign to identify and encourage individuals to apply for certain individual income tax credits; authorizing the Comptroller to enter into a certain data sharing agreement with other State agencies to carry out the awareness campaign; and requiring, for each of fiscal years 2026 through 2030, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $300,000 for the awareness campaign.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0845
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-13)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Individual Income Tax Credit Eligibility Awareness Campaign
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {443626/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Individual Income Tax Credit Eligibility Awareness Campaign
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (123-13) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-116.1 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 9:01 AM
Click to return on the top page