Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Police Officers and Probation Agents Scholarship Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Bailey, James, West, McKay, and Folden
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of an eligible institution for the Maryland Police Officers and Probation Agents Scholarship Program to include a community college in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0949 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 10:45 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {783721/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Police Officers and Probation Agents Scholarship Program - Alterations
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Appropriations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 10:45 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
(   18-101,   18-103,   18-4001 through 18-4004, 18-601   )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:45 AM
Click to return on the top page