Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Gile, James, Rosapepe, Zucker, Salling, Muse, McKay, Carozza, Hettleman, Jackson, Kramer, Folden, King, Guzzone, Lam, Elfreth, Waldstreicher, West, Augustine, Brooks, Feldman, Hester, Kagan, Lewis Young, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Emergency Medical Services Board, in collaboration with the Maryland Department of Health, to develop and implement an initiative under the Public Access Automated External Defibrillator Program to require that naloxone be co-located with each automated external defibrillator placed in a public building; establishing a certain immunity from liability for individuals who administer naloxone made available under the initiative in response to a known or suspected drug overdose; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {693723/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {363429/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page