Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Safety and Firearm Crimes
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting an employee of the Department of Natural Resources in the course of performing official duties from certain prohibitions against knowingly wearing, carrying, or transporting a firearm in certain locations; requiring a person or entity operating a gun buyback program to destroy a firearm, including all components and parts attached to the firearm, that is surrendered at a certain gun buyback program; classifying the theft of a firearm or the trafficking of a regulated firearm as a felony; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Gun Buyback Programs - Destruction of Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Firearm Safety and Firearm Crimes
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {953724/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Gun Buyback Programs - Destruction of Firearms
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {583727/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Firearm Safety and Firearm Crimes
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Judiciary 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {683126/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Floor Amendment {953724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-114,   5-901, 5-902 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:46 PM
Click to return on the top page