Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Environmental Justice Districts - Designation and Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a resident of a local jurisdiction or an overburdened and underserved community in the State to submit an application to the Department of the Environment to request the designation of a certain area as an environmental justice district in a certain manner; requiring the Department to publish the application process and criteria used for evaluating an application on or before December 1, 2024; requiring the Department to hold a certain hearing on a certain permit application under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Environmental Justice Districts - Designation and Requirements
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page