Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Appropriations for School Safety Expenditures - School Security Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Corderman and Hester
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an increase to a certain annual appropriation for certain school safety expenditures for fiscal year 2026 and further increasing permitted appropriations for certain school safety expenditures beginning in fiscal year 2027; requiring the Maryland Center for School Safety, the State Department of Education, the Maryland Coordination and Analysis Center, and the Interagency Commission on School Construction jointly to review and provide guidance on the state of physical security in schools; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1336
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313322/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {383829/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303728/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Appropriations for School Safety Expenditures - School Security Employees
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {313322/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hester) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {313322/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {383829/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Appropriations for School Safety Expenditures - School Security Employees
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {303728/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Appropriations for School Safety Expenditures - School Security Employees
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page