Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Corderman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute to the Transportation Trust Fund revenue from the sales and use tax that is attributable to the sale of electricity used to charge an electric vehicle at an electric vehicle charging station or used to charge an electric vehicle and is not sold under a residential or domestic rate schedule on file with the Public Service Commission; requiring the Comptroller to determine, on or before December 31, 2024, a method of calculating certain sales and use taxes and to distribute the taxes in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1280
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments {753321/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax – Electricity to Charge Electric Vehicles – Transportation Trust Fund
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page