Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Registration - Annual Surcharge
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the owners of zero-emission vehicles and plug-in electric drive vehicles that are not zero-emission vehicles to pay an annual surcharge of $150 and $122.50, respectively; authorizing the surcharge to be paid in installment payments; requiring the proceeds collected from the surcharge to be deposited into the Transportation Trust Fund; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to refuse to register or renew or transfer the registration of a motor vehicle for failure to pay the surcharge or installments.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Registration - Annual Surcharge
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573829/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {153021/1 (Senator McKay) Rejected (6-38)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {833327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Registration - Annual Surcharge
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Registration - Annual Surcharge
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {573829/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {573829/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {153021/1 (Senator McKay) Rejected (6-38) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {833327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Registration - Annual Surcharge
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page