Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Sponsored by
Senators Gile and Folden
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing direct-to-consumer alcoholic beverages delivery permits authorizing the direct delivery of beer, wine, or liquor to a consumer in the State; establishing the requirements an individual must meet to qualify for a direct-to-consumer alcoholic beverages delivery permit; establishing a maximum amount that a recipient of an alcoholic beverages delivery may receive annually; and repealing a maximum amount that a consumer may purchase when visiting certain alcoholic beverage manufacturers.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1217
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {553722/1 (Senator Gile) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery and Direct Shipment
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {523629/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Floor Amendment {553722/1 (Senator Gile) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Economic Matters 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments {433528/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries, Wineries, and Distilleries - Direct Delivery
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 9:01 AM
Click to return on the top page