Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
9–1–1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Jackson, Augustine, Brooks, Gallion, Hester, Lewis Young, McKay, M. Washington, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the 9-1-1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to review the reports submitted by the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland, identify and examine certain recruitment and retention challenges, and make certain recommendations; and requiring the Workgroup to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an interim report of its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2024, and a final report of its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1162
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 9–1–1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - 9–1–1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - 9–1–1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {283323/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - 9–1–1 Specialist Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 10:59 AM
Click to return on the top page