Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the termination date of certain grants; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; and changing the names of certain grantees.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823025/1
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {983623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {223225/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {823025/1 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zucker) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {823025/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {983623/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing canceled
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {753226/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Floor Amendment {223225/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
(   2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020, 2021 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 4:18 PM
Click to return on the top page