Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class M-F (Municipal Family Fun Center) alcoholic beverages license in the 40th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a certain Class B beer, wine, and liquor license to a restaurant in a certain location; and authorizing a certain Class A license issued for a certain location to remain unexpired until the end of July 1, 2025, for the purpose of renewal.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1198
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed 47-0 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Economic Matters 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {223429/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page