Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the bonding authority from $1,400,000,000 to $1,700,000,000 for the University System of Maryland; approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland for financing the projects; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Senate 3/09/2022 3/10/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Senate 3/23/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing canceled
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page