Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the administration and membership of the West North Avenue Development Authority; specifying the powers and duties of the Authority, subject to certain limitations; exempting the Authority from certain provisions of law; requiring the Authority to take certain actions regarding the finances of the Authority; exempting the Authority from certain taxation or assessments under certain circumstances; establishing the West North Avenue Development Authority Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1427
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 10:29 PM
Click to return on the top page